TN SB0620 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides for alternative system of manner of death determination review in counties where the chief medical examiner of the regional forensic center acts as the county medical examiner; allows next of kin to hire independent forensic pathologist for review; clarifies that next of kin do not need to complete mediation prior to seeking judicial relief. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 7 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides for alternative system of manner of death determination review in counties where the chief medical examiner of the regional forensic center acts as the county medical examiner; allows next of kin to hire independent forensic pathologist for review; clarifies that next of kin do not need to complete mediation prior to seeking judicial relief. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 7 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1005 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-25 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback