TN SB0618 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, permits the use of a person's full social security number; taxpayer identification number; birth date; name, if the person is a minor; or financial account number in court filings regarding parenting plans. - Amends TCA Title 20, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20, Chapter 6, relative to civil procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Effective date(s) 04/04/2023
2023-04-18 Pub. Ch. 124
2023-04-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-23HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-20HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-03-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-03-16HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-03-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/13/2023
2023-03-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0985 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 124

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback