TN SB0617 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Buffering Undo Regulatory Non-Compliance (BURN) Act," which requires local authorities to file certified copies of notices of violation or citations based solely upon evidence obtained from an unmanned traffic enforcement camera with the municipal court or county court. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Buffering Undo Regulatory Non-Compliance (BURN) Act," which requires local authorities to file certified copies of notices of violation or citations based solely upon evidence obtained from an unmanned traffic enforcement camera with the municipal court or county court. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Motion to Reconsider Failed.