TN SB0613 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a registered sexual offender whose victim was a minor from participating in activities associated with Halloween; establishes a curfew for such sexual offenders from 6:00 p.m. on October 31 until 4:00 a.m. on November 1. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2, relative to sexual offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0176 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration