TN SB0612 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, corrects a reference to the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives by replacing it with a reference to the insurance committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, corrects a reference to the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives by replacing it with a reference to the insurance committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0709 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee