TN SB0611 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor offense of persuading or influencing a witness or prospective witness, in a manner that does not meet the definition of coercion, to testify falsely, withhold truthful information, or to elude legal process in a case involving a domestic abuse victim. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 35; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor offense of persuading or influencing a witness or prospective witness, in a manner that does not meet the definition of coercion, to testify falsely, withhold truthful information, or to elude legal process in a case involving a domestic abuse victim. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 35; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0067)
2019-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0042)
2019-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-05SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0973 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback