TN SB0610 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends, from 10 to 14 days, the time period within which the committee appointed by a county legislative body to study surveys and plans of county roads has to reduce its recommendations to writing and file them with the county clerk. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends, from 10 to 14 days, the time period within which the committee appointed by a county legislative body to study surveys and plans of county roads has to reduce its recommendations to writing and file them with the county clerk. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0789 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback