TN SB0601 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from within the first year of service to within the first six months of service, the time in which a state university board member appointed or selected on or after July 1, 2019, must attend an orientation administered by the Tennessee higher education commission. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201.
Title
As introduced, changes, from within the first year of service to within the first six months of service, the time in which a state university board member appointed or selected on or after July 1, 2019, must attend an orientation administered by the Tennessee higher education commission. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0739 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education