TN SB0601 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to study and report on recommendations for legislation concerning telehealth and telemedicine under existing statutes to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate by January 15, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to study and report on recommendations for legislation concerning telehealth and telemedicine under existing statutes to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate by January 15, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateDeferred to Summer Study
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
2018-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2017-04-04SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0518 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback