TN SB0598 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates any facility on the campus of a public institution of higher education that is designed and used for school-sanctioned sporting events as a sports authority facility for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, designates any facility on the campus of a public institution of higher education that is designed and used for school-sanctioned sporting events as a sports authority facility for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 99 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/08/2019 | |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 70, Nays 21, PNV 1 |
2019-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0850 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 99