TN SB0594 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the comptroller to report to the chairs of the senate finance, ways and means committee and the finance, ways and means committee of the house of representatives concerning the number of counties and municipalities that have adopted the property tax freeze program by ordinance or resolution by January 15, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, requires the comptroller to report to the chairs of the senate finance, ways and means committee and the finance, ways and means committee of the house of representatives concerning the number of counties and municipalities that have adopted the property tax freeze program by ordinance or resolution by January 15, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0544 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee