TN SB0589 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Eddie Conrad Act," which establishes the number of points to be charged to a person's driving record for violations of driving while using a wireless telecommunications device. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-199.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 55-8-199, relative to traffic safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Effective date(s) 01/01/2024
2023-05-24 Pub. Ch. 428
2023-05-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-20HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 0
2023-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0195)
2023-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0196)
2023-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-03-16HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-03-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-13SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2023-03-13SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0120)
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-03-09SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2023
2023-03-07SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-06SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2023
2023-03-06SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0043)
2023-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023
2023-02-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-27SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/6/2023
2023-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023
2023-02-22SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2023-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/22/2023
2023-02-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/22/2023
2023-02-08SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/15/2023
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0485 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 428

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback