TN SB0588 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021, 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021, 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers all powers and duties regarding the Tennessee Sports Gaming Act to the sports wagering advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to the duties of the sports wagering advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/27/2021, 01/01/2022 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 593 | |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0440) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 13, PNV 4 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0440) |
2021-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0366) |
2021-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0342) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593