TN SB0587 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes certain circumstances in which a citation in lieu of arrest shall not be issued; makes various other changes and corrections. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes certain circumstances in which a citation in lieu of arrest shall not be issued; makes various other changes and corrections. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-03-21SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0079)
2019-03-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0122)
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-14SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0715 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback