TN SB0586 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the court fee and tax advisory council; requires the council to consider and make recommendations on legislation that would create or increase litigation taxes or fees on criminal or civil cases and compile an annual report on all existing litigation taxes and fees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16.
Title
As introduced, creates the court fee and tax advisory council; requires the council to consider and make recommendations on legislation that would create or increase litigation taxes or fees on criminal or civil cases and compile an annual report on all existing litigation taxes and fees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0670 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary