TN SB0584 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, under certain circumstances, allows members of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to change from the optional form to the regular form of retirement in favor of a different beneficiary in the event of divorce. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-606.
Title
As introduced, under certain circumstances, allows members of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to change from the optional form to the regular form of retirement in favor of a different beneficiary in the event of divorce. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-606.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-03 | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0017 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-03 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0584&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0584.pdf |