TN SB0580 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a municipal energy authority whose principal office is located within a county with a population of 25,000 or less that has also been designated as a tier 3 or a tier 4 enhancement county to provide cable or internet service within the portion of the county that is outside of the authority’s electric system service area if the authority obtains the consent of each telephone cooperative, electric cooperative, and municipal or other governmental electric system in whose territory the authority will provide those services. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 36, relative to broadband services authorization.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0821 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee