TN SB0578 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes the requirement that the state board establish guidelines to suspend, deny, or revoke the license of a teacher who is delinquent or in default on a repayment or service obligation under a guaranteed student loan; deletes a provision that authorized the state board to exercise discretion with regard to certain licensure actions if the teacher's default or delinquency is the result of a medical hardship. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-108.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-5-108, relative to licensure actions taken based on a teacher's failure to comply with the terms of the teacher's student loan obligation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-18 Effective date(s) 03/31/2023
2023-04-18 Pub. Ch. 93
2023-03-31SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-13HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 2
2023-03-13HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-02-16HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-02-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-02-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/13/2023
2023-02-08SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-01-30SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/8/2023
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0358 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 93

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback