TN SB0577 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits an eligible petitioner to have multiple, nonviolent convictions for offenses that resulted from the petitioner's status as a victim of human trafficking expunged if the expunction is in the best interest of justice and public safety and other requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
As enacted, permits an eligible petitioner to have multiple, nonviolent convictions for offenses that resulted from the petitioner's status as a victim of human trafficking expunged if the expunction is in the best interest of justice and public safety and other requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 199 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0201) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0201) |
2019-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0201) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0125) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0193 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 199