TN SB0574 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a person, political subdivision, or public official, in connection with a state emergency, from categorizing or proclaiming by order, rule, or regulation that a lawful occupation is non-essential, or otherwise proclaiming by order, rule, or regulation that a lawful occupation is prohibited from operating based on what the lawful occupation is; specifies that a person harmed by a violation of the prohibition may bring a civil action for actual damages or declaratory relief. - Amends TCA Title 45; Title 47 and Title 58, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45; Title 47 and Title 58, Chapter 2, relative to emergency powers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-27SenateFailed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
2024-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024
2024-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024
2024-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024
2024-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to final calendar of 2024
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0694 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback