TN SB0572 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes electronic submission of the annual report on distribution and abuse of controlled substances from the commissioner of health to the health committees of the senate and the house of representatives under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes electronic submission of the annual report on distribution and abuse of controlled substances from the commissioner of health to the health committees of the senate and the house of representatives under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2020 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 4-3-19 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1011 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.