TN SB0572 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes teacher evaluations and the student’s performance on assessments while a student of the teacher as factors that determine a student’s assignment to a public school; requires the department of education to conduct a study relative to student placement and teacher effectiveness. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 31.
Title
As introduced, includes teacher evaluations and the student’s performance on assessments while a student of the teacher as factors that determine a student’s assignment to a public school; requires the department of education to conduct a study relative to student placement and teacher effectiveness. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 31.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0997 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs