TN SB0570 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to report the total amount of state funds paid to acquire property through eminent domain in the 2017-2018 year to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees and the office of legislative budget analysis by January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 29, Chapter 17; Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to report the total amount of state funds paid to acquire property through eminent domain in the 2017-2018 year to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees and the office of legislative budget analysis by January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 29, Chapter 17; Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 65.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0861 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback