TN SB0568 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the bureau of TennCare from imposing certain requirements on nursing facility providers as vendors of the TennCare program unless certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the bureau of TennCare from imposing certain requirements on nursing facility providers as vendors of the TennCare program unless certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0621 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0568&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0568.pdf |