TN SB0566 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the dollar limits to the aggregate value of homestead exemptions, instead creating an exemption for a principal place of residence that is located on a single parcel of land not to exceed five acres in area. - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 2, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 26, Chapter 2, Part 3, relative to homestead exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-21SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-21HousePassed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0257)
2021-04-21HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-14SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-04-14SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0213)
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0676 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback