TN SB0565 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced authorizes municipalities operating an electric plant to provide telecommunication services, including fiber-to-the-premises, in geographical areas both within and outside of the electric plant's service area. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to fiber-to-the-premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0623 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.