TN SB0565 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 216 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 09/01/2017 | |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0321) |
2017-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0226) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0937 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216