TN SB0564 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the punishment for a first violation of unlawful carrying of a handgun; prohibits law enforcement officer from confiscating the person's handgun and requires issuance of citation in lieu of arrest for such offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1307 and Section 40-7-118.
Title
As introduced, reduces the punishment for a first violation of unlawful carrying of a handgun; prohibits law enforcement officer from confiscating the person's handgun and requires issuance of citation in lieu of arrest for such offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1307 and Section 40-7-118.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0645 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee