TN SB0563 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, from May 25, 2021, to July 1, 2024, the county trustee to proceed against delinquent taxpayers by retaining an agent to collect delinquent personal property taxes, interest, costs, and attorneys' fees. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to delinquent personal property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 522 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0358 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021