TN SB0561 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the portion of a person's sentence for first degree murder that must be served prior to becoming eligible for parole to 60 percent of 60 years if sentenced to imprisonment for life for an offense committed during certain dates or 100 percent of 60 years if sentenced to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Section 40-35-501.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Section 40-35-501, relative to parole eligibility for persons sentenced to imprisonment for life.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4, PNV 1
2021-04-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0401)
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-07SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2021-04-07SenateRecalled from Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1532 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback