TN SB0561 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, divides the current 21st judicial district into a new 21st district consisting of Williamson County and a new 32nd judicial district consisting of Hickman, Lewis, and Perry counties. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18, Chapter 4 and Title 18, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, divides the current 21st judicial district into a new 21st district consisting of Williamson County and a new 32nd judicial district consisting of Hickman, Lewis, and Perry counties. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18, Chapter 4 and Title 18, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 3 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Pub. Ch. 530 | |
2020-03-16 | Effective date(s) 03/10/2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 1 (Amendment 3 - HA0519) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed H as Am., Ayes 84, Nays 5, PNV 2 |
2020-02-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0519) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6, PNV 1 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0404) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1156 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530