TN SB0558 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to notify and cooperate with the law enforcement agency in the jurisdiction where the conduct occurred if it is reasonably foreseeable that conduct under investigation by the department will likely result in criminal prosecution. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department to notify and cooperate with the law enforcement agency in the jurisdiction where the conduct occurred if it is reasonably foreseeable that conduct under investigation by the department will likely result in criminal prosecution. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-12SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0015 (Crossfiled) 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback