TN SB0552 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes certain prohibitions concerning gifts made by commissioners of the Tennessee public utility commission that are different from other applicable gift prohibitions found in law. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Section 65-1-107.
Title
As introduced, removes certain prohibitions concerning gifts made by commissioners of the Tennessee public utility commission that are different from other applicable gift prohibitions found in law. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Section 65-1-107.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0343 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0552&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB0552.pdf |