TN SB0551 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a sales tax holiday for the retail sale of gun safes and gun safety devices if sold between 12:01 a.m. on July 1, 2021, and 11:59 p.m. on June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to taxation of gun safes and gun safety devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 592
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-05SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0463)
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0441)
2021-05-04SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-29SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-09SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
2021-03-02SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/9/2021
2021-02-23SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0761 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback