TN SB0548 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7, relative to family leave for public employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021
2021-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1296 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback