TN SB0542 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows a revocable living trust that becomes irrevocable upon the death of the settlor to refer to a written statement of personal property not otherwise disposed of by the revocable trust; gives a trustee who has resigned or been removed the right and authority to petition the court for a release and discharge from all liability related to the trust, makes various other revisions. - Amends TCA Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 34; Title 35 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows a revocable living trust that becomes irrevocable upon the death of the settlor to refer to a written statement of personal property not otherwise disposed of by the revocable trust; gives a trustee who has resigned or been removed the right and authority to petition the court for a release and discharge from all liability related to the trust, makes various other revisions. - Amends TCA Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 34; Title 35 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-15HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0263)
2019-04-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0161)
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0675 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback