TN SB0540 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires licensure as a healthcare professional for a person to competently treat a mental health disorder; creates certain exemptions; provides for an action to recover damages. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, requires licensure as a healthcare professional for a person to competently treat a mental health disorder; creates certain exemptions; provides for an action to recover damages. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 359 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 1 (Amendment 2 - HA0448) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0448) |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0334) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0295) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0995 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 359