TN SB0537 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that in an action to recover damages for nuisance a court cannot award damages to a party found to have maintained the nuisance. - Amends TCA Title 24 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that in an action to recover damages for nuisance a court cannot award damages to a party found to have maintained the nuisance. - Amends TCA Title 24 and Title 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0650 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee