TN SB0534 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the annual budget of a local government be on the same basis of accounting as required by generally accepted accounting principles; requires the comptroller of the treasury provide guidance to the form of that budget, including supplemental schedules, as necessary, to demonstrate the local government has adequate cash to meet its current obligations, including principal and interest, as applicable; makes other revisions to provisions governing budgeting by local governments. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-305; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 4-3-305; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 68, relative to public finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 4/28/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 256 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0652 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256