TN SB0533 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires owners of property that is exempt from property tax and being used as an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities to agree to make payments in lieu of tax to the local taxing jurisdiction. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires owners of property that is exempt from property tax and being used as an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities to agree to make payments in lieu of tax to the local taxing jurisdiction. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0504 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee