TN SB0531 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes a person relocating to Tennessee eligible to be issued a handgun carry permit without completing the classroom and firing range requirements if, within 5 years from the application, the person had a valid handgun carry permit in another state with substantially similar classroom and firing range requirements. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As introduced, makes a person relocating to Tennessee eligible to be issued a handgun carry permit without completing the classroom and firing range requirements if, within 5 years from the application, the person had a valid handgun carry permit in another state with substantially similar classroom and firing range requirements. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0506 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee