TN SB0527 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires county and municipal mayors, and any other authorities, who appoint members to municipal solid waste regional boards to strive to ensure that at least two elected officials serve on each regional board; authorizes the department of environment and conservation to provide guidelines and best practices for composting and recycling to regional board members, advisory committees, and Class I, Class III, and Class IV landfill owners and operators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires county and municipal mayors, and any other authorities, who appoint members to municipal solid waste regional boards to strive to ensure that at least two elected officials serve on each regional board; authorizes the department of environment and conservation to provide guidelines and best practices for composting and recycling to regional board members, advisory committees, and Class I, Class III, and Class IV landfill owners and operators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Pub. Ch. 335
2017-05-19 Effective date(s) 05/09/2017
2017-05-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-05-01HousePassed H., Ayes 83, Nays 3, PNV 0
2017-05-01HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0182)
2017-05-01HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-03SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2017-04-03SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0200)
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/27/2017
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/20/2017
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2017
2017-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0724 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback