TN SB0527 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-12SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2015-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0512 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback