TN SB0527 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends certain protections to private foundations from governmental intrusion. - Amends TCA Title 35, Chapter 9, Part 1 and Title 48.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends certain protections to private foundations from governmental intrusion. - Amends TCA Title 35, Chapter 9, Part 1 and Title 48.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HousePub. Ch. 193
2013-04-29HouseEffective date(s) 04/23/2013
2013-04-23HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-11HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-10HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-09HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-08HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1
2013-04-08HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-03-21SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-03-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-03-18SenatePassed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2013-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/18/2013
2013-03-13SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
2013-03-12SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/13/2013
2013-03-07SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
2013-02-04SenateP2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
2013-01-31SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-30SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0423 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 193

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback