TN SB0527 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-14 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds certain persons to the controlled substance database advisory committee; requires the committee to release certain database information to the Tennessee bureau of investigation and to a manager or prosecution unit conducting any investigation, adjudication or prosecution that involves a controlled substance. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds certain persons to the controlled substance database advisory committee; requires the committee to release certain database information to the Tennessee bureau of investigation and to a manager or prosecution unit conducting any investigation, adjudication or prosecution that involves a controlled substance. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-14 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2011-02-10 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-09 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0955 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback