TN SB0527 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the state to pay for court-ordered mental health evaluations of juvenile offenders when charged with an offense that would be a felony if committed by an adult. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the state to pay for court-ordered mental health evaluations of juvenile offenders when charged with an offense that would be a felony if committed by an adult. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-12 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2009-02-11 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-10 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0350 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-18 - Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback