TN SB0516 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits eligible postsecondary institutions, for purposes of state lottery proceeds, from denying a student residential housing on the campus of, or in affiliation with, the eligible postsecondary institution solely because of the student's award of a Tennessee STEP UP scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4 and Title 49, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits eligible postsecondary institutions, for purposes of state lottery proceeds, from denying a student residential housing on the campus of, or in affiliation with, the eligible postsecondary institution solely because of the student's award of a Tennessee STEP UP scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4 and Title 49, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4
2019-03-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0111)
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 1
2019-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-03-11SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm.
2019-02-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/27/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0586 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback