TN SB0512 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes qualifying retailers in the restaurant and other eating places industry or the mobile food services industry, and other retail businesses that have lost at least 25 percent in revenue, to temporarily deduct up to $50,000 of net taxable sales from their monthly state sales tax return and retain the resulting state sales tax revenue. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to temporary tax relief for certain retailers and businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0512&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB0512.pdf |