TN SB0508 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a medical student in good academic standing with an accredited medical college in this state to receive priority consideration over a medical student attending medical college outside of this state in the process of assigning clinical rotations to a healthcare facility contracting with a state medical school or accepting state funding. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a medical student in good academic standing with an accredited medical college in this state to receive priority consideration over a medical student attending medical college outside of this state in the process of assigning clinical rotations to a healthcare facility contracting with a state medical school or accepting state funding. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateDeferred to Summer Study
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0783 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback