TN SB0506 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Failed In S. E,C&T Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 5 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires any permit issued by the department of environment and conservation to specify the types of waste a facility is prohibited from receiving for disposal or processing; prohibits any person from knowingly accepting for disposal or processing certain nuclear or radioactive materials in any landfill. - Amends TCA Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires any permit issued by the department of environment and conservation to specify the types of waste a facility is prohibited from receiving for disposal or processing; prohibits any person from knowingly accepting for disposal or processing certain nuclear or radioactive materials in any landfill. - Amends TCA Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - Senate - S. E&E COMM.: Failed in Environment Com. (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Failed in Environment Com. (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Failed In S. E,C&T Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 5 PNV 0
2011-03-31 Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 4/6/2011
2011-03-09 Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 4/6/2011
2011-03-03 Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 3/9/2011
2011-02-14 P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm.
2011-02-10 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-09 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0700 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback